Accounts and annual returns EAGLE RISING MINISTRIES

Charity number: 1115020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 31 October 2023 365 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 31 October 2023 730 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2023 1095 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1720 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1720 days