THE RESURGENCE TRUST

Charity number: 1120414
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £628.57k £732.41k £1.06m £806.73k £713.09k
Total expenditure £567.53k £702.13k £696.03k £657.32k £695.14k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A £48.70k
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A £99.98k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £205.61k £231.80k £575.50k £366.95k £244.61k
Income - Other trading activities £50.90k £60.17k £71.50k £61.37k £99.73k
Income - Charitable activities £353.68k £419.41k £378.63k £357.78k £346.38k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.62k £2.45k £1.94k £1.24k £675
Income - Other £15.76k £18.58k £30.72k £19.39k £21.70k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £14.29k £0 £10.54k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £523.09k £679.86k £650.57k £648.66k £656.71k
Expenditure - Raising funds £43.48k £22.23k £44.82k £8.11k £36.51k
Expenditure - Governance £1.75k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £953 £42 £636 £553 £1.92k