Trustees THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR BUDDHIST STUDIES

Charity number: 1114960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Michael Mowat Shaw Chair 17 March 2020
None on record
Dr Justin Otzen Meiland Trustee 21 October 2021
None on record
Professor Ramesh Babubhai Kapadia Trustee 26 May 2021
None on record
Dr Jonathan Bernard Katz Trustee 27 October 2020
None on record
Dr Roger Farmer Trustee 27 October 2020
None on record
PROF DAVID NICHOLAS GELLNER Trustee 25 April 2017
None on record
Victoria Ying JIN Trustee 25 January 2017
None on record
Dr Tony Morris Trustee 22 October 2015
None on record
Janice Ruth Block Trustee 22 October 2015
None on record
PROF Jan Westerhoff Trustee 14 October 2014
THE PRINCIPAL AND FELLOWS OF THE COLLEGE OF THE LADY MARGARET IN THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD
Received: On time
PROFESSOR R F GOMBRICH Trustee
THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR HINDU STUDIES
Received: On time
GEOFFREY MICHAEL BAMFORD Trustee
THE SOCIETY FOR THE WIDER UNDERSTANDING OF THE BUDDHIST TRADITION 'SO-WIDE'
Received: On time
VENERABLE KHAMMAI DHAMMASAMI Trustee
None on record