ST PETERS C OF E JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Developing effective relationships between staff, parents and other associated with St Peter's C of E Junior school. Engaging in activities or providing facilities or equipment which support St Peter's C of E Junior school and advance the education of its pupils.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 05 July 2006: Standard registration
- ST PETERS JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Anne Louise Calow | Chair | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kimberley Charlotte Coleman | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Blaber | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Rebecca Holmes | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
PARDEEP KUMAR | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Saema Enjela | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ina Nikonova-Lavda | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sandeep Bansal | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Sims | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jaspal S Dhesi | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Yin Hung Christine Lee | Trustee | 07 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.75k | £1.14k | £1.26k | £7.81k | £7.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.57k | £3.31k | £590 | £5.97k | £4.59k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 19 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 18 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 18 January 2022 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 13 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 1. DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF, PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2. ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE DERBYSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. PETERS C OF E JUNIOR SCHOOL
THORNHILL ROAD
LITTLEOVER
DERBY
DE23 6FZ
- Phone:
- 01332 767158
- Email:
- admin@stpeters.derby.sch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window