DOMINION HOUSING GROUP LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Former non-asset holding parent of social housing group prior to merger and transfer of all engagements to A2Dominion Housing Group Limited. In the process of being wound up.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 October 2006: Standard registration
- 05 August 2011: Removed (Transferred to exempt chy)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2007 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £169.00m | £11.63m | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £136.20m | £11.59m | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £76.40m | £11.59m | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.00m | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £94.70m | £2.00k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £58.60m | £11.59m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £339.00k | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £100.06m | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 09 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 02 April 2010 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 29 June 2009 | 334 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | 22 May 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 16 FEBRUARY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 29 SEPTEMBER 2006.
Charitable objects
(3) THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY SHALL BE TO CARRY ON FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY THE BUSINESS OF:- (I) PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF HOUSES, HOSTELS OR ANY OTHER HOUSING ACCOMMODATION AND ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES, SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE FOR PERSONS: (A) IN NECESSITOUS CIRCUMSTANCES UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS; (B) WHO ARE AGED, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED (WHETHER PHYSICALLY OR MENTALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK, AND ARE IN NEED OF THE ACCOMMODATION OR OTHER BENEFITS PROVIDED BY VIRTUE OF THEIR CONDITION; (II) PROMOTING THE EFFECTIVE APPLICATION OF RESOURCES FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES BY THE PROVISION OF REASONABLE ASSISTANCE IN THE SECURING OF ACCOMMODATION FOR THOSE PERSONS (AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING WITH THEM) WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH ACCOMMODATION BY VIRTUE OF: (A) THEIR EMPLOYMENT IN THE PUBLIC OR VOLUNTARY SECTORS IN A RELEVANT EMPLOYMENT IN SUCH MANNER OR CAPACITY AS TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RELIEVE SICKNESS, PROMOTE PUBLIC HEALTH, RELIEVE CHARITABLE NEED, PROTECT HUMAN LIFE AND PROPERTY, PROMOTE THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW, OR ADVANCE OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) THE MAINTENANCE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY OF ITS INFRASTRUCTURE, INCLUDING SUPPLIES OF GAS, WATER, ELECTRICITY AND FOOD, OF TRANSPORT AND OTHER MEANS OF COMMUNICATION, OF TELECOMMUNICATION INFORMATION AND INFORMATION TECHNOLOGY SERVICES, AND OF EMERGENCY SERVICES, AND (B) THE FACT THAT THEY COULD NOT AFFORD FROM RESOURCES AVAILABLE TO THEM TO SECURE SUCH ACCOMMODATION ON NORMAL COMMERCIAL TERMS; AND FOR THE PURPOSES OF THIS OBJECT: "PUBLIC SECTOR" MEANS ANY DEPARTMENT OF CENTRAL OR LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR HEALTH OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITY; "VOLUNTARY SECTOR" MEANS CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS; "CHARITIES" MEANS ORGANISATIONS WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES; "VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS" MEANS INDEPENDENT ORGANISATIONS, WHICH ARE ESTABLISHED FOR PURPOSES THAT ADD VALUE TO THE COMMUNITY AS A WHOLE, OR TO A SIGNIFICANT SECTION OF THE COMMUNITY, AND WHICH ARE NOT PERMITTED BY THEIR CONSTITUTION TO MAKE A PROFIT FOR PRIVATE DISTRIBUTION. VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS DO NOT INCLUDE LOCAL GOVERNMENT OR OTHER STATUTORY AUTHORITIES; "RELEVANT EMPLOYMENT" MEANS EMPLOYMENT BY AN EMPLOYER WHICH THOUGH NOT IN THE PUBLIC OR VOLUNTARY SECTOR IS ENGAGED IN THE PROVISION OF SERVICES EQUIVALENT TO THOSE REFERRED TO IN SUB CLAUSE (I) ABOVE; (III) PROVIDING SERVICES, ADVICE OR ASSISTANCE UPON TERMS APPROPRIATE TO THEIR MEANS TO AGED, DISABLED OR HANDICAPPED (WHETHER MENTALLY OR PHYSICALLY) OR CHRONICALLY SICK PERSONS IN NEED THEREOF IN ARRANGING OR CARRYING OUT WORKS OF IMPROVEMENT REPAIR OR MAINTENANCE TO HOMES OCCUPIED BY THEM AND PROVIDING ANY ASSOCIATED AMENITIES SPECIALLY DESIGNED TO MEET THE DISABILITIES AND REQUIREMENTS OF SUCH PERSONS; (IV) PROVIDING FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OR RECREATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE COMMUNITY; AND (V) CARRYING OUT OR PROMOTING ANY OTHER CHARITABLE OBJECT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window