Financial history BORDER TERRIER WELFARE

Charity number: 1116853
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £89.44k £83.77k £87.55k £105.79k £144.35k
Total expenditure £77.44k £72.25k £52.04k £51.50k £91.23k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A