THE UFTON COURT EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1116659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 01 April 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 01 April 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2019 02 April 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 02 April 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 10 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 15 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 15 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 27 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 27 March 2017 On time Download