THE UFTON COURT EDUCATIONAL TRUST

Charity number: 1116659
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
CHARLIE CLARE Trustee 20 March 2013 None on record
Edward Crookes Trustee 20 March 2014 None on record
Jason Chaffer Trustee 20 March 2014 None on record
Mary Riall Chair 01 September 2015 None on record
NICHOLAS BURROWS Trustee 16 March 2011 None on record
Helen Hyde Trustee 29 March 2019
CRAFTS COUNCIL Received: On time
Geoffrey William Claude Eversfield Trustee 01 May 2016
ST ANDREWS (PANGBOURNE) SCHOOL TRUST LIMITED Received: On time