THAMES CHASE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Environmental regeneration
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£723,794
Donations and legacies | £513.36k | |
Charitable activities | £173.83k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £36.61k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£665,676
Raising funds | £211.14k | |
Charitable activities | £453.47k | |
Other | £1.07k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £395,005 from 5 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £212.21k | |
Charitable expenditure | £453.47k | |
Retained for future use | £58.12k |
People

14 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
90 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Barking And Dagenham
- Essex
- Havering
- Thurrock
Governance
- 31 July 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ian Michael Pirie | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Vincent McLoughlin | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Louise Luheshi | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Gary Anderson | Trustee | 22 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Stephen Michael Cantle | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Walters Langley | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas Walters Langley | Trustee | 06 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
ROGER CHARLES HIRST | Trustee | 29 June 2015 |
|
|||||
Martin John Barkwith | Trustee | 15 January 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £803.66k | £855.67k | £937.58k | £763.06k | £723.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £798.88k | £677.09k | £888.39k | £737.58k | £665.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £87.43k | £286.00k | £257.20k | £279.44k | £395.01k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £626.69k | £428.62k | £350.78k | £377.40k | £513.36k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £175.60k | £427.05k | £586.71k | £379.00k | £173.83k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £1.37k | £272 | £98 | £6.67k | £36.61k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £330.18k | £253.20k | £401.35k | £439.31k | £453.47k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £468.69k | £422.95k | £485.97k | £297.11k | £211.14k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £903 | £940 | £1.07k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £940 | £1.07k | £1.16k | £1.07k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £276.98k | £270.80k | £266.64k | £280.54k | £292.57k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £682.90k | £893.62k | £889.66k | £1.01m | £994.02k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £497.13k | £522.82k | £465.50k | £570.47k | £512.19k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 09 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JANUARY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 7 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE WITHIN THE LONDON AND ESSEX AND THAMES GATEWAY AREA AND BEYOND CONNECTED WITH THE ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT, MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND LANDSCAPE AND IN PARTICULAR TO; 1) PROMOTE, PROVIDE AND ENHANCE WOODLAND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; 2) PROMOTE THE GENERAL IMPROVEMENT OF AGRICULTURE AND OF INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE, PARTICULARLY IN RELATION TO WOODLAND OR FORESTRY PRODUCTS 3) PROMOTE AND PROVIDE FOR THE IMPROVEMENT OF DERELICT LAND OR HARMFUL SITES; 4) PROVIDE OR HELP TO PROVIDE FOR THE GENERAL PUBLIC FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURETIME OCCUPATION PARTICULARLY INVOLVING THE ENJOYMENT OF LAND AND WOODLAND AS A PUBLIC AMENITY (AND IN FURTHERANCE TO HELP TO PROVIDE SAFE AND CONVENIENT ROUTES AND MODES OF TRANSPORT FOR THE PUBLIC, FOR SAFE CYCLING AND FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF FACILITIES INCLUDING NATURE TRAILS, RESERVES AND SANCTUARIES, HORSE AND CYCLE AND FOOTWAYS, PARKLAND AND VISITOR FACILITIES AND CAR PARKS) 5) PROMOTE COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR PLAYING PARTICULAR SPORTS 6) EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ENVIRONMENTAL MATTERS, IN ECOLOGY AND PROVIDE BETTER APPRECIATION OF THE ENVIRONMENTS AND WAYS OF BETTER SERVING, PROTECTING AND IMPROVING THE SAME AND EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE ENVIRONMENT AND ITS INTERACTION WITH THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC WELLBEING OF THE COMMUNITY; 7) PROMOTE THE ARTS WITHIN THE WOODLAND AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENTS; 8) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ECOLOGY AND USE OF THE NATURAL ENVIRONMENT AND ALL SPECIES LIVING IN IT; 9) PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, ENHANCEMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE ENVIRONMENT AND TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE IMPORTANCE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT IN RELATION TO ALL THE ACTIVITIES OF THE CHARITY. FOR THE PURPOSE OF THIS CLAUSE THE PHRASE "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" SHALL MEAN DEVELOPMENT THAT MEETS THE NEEDS OF THE PRESENT WITHOUT COMPROMISING THE ABILITY OF FUTURE GENERATIONS TO MEET THEIR OWN NEEDS AND IN APPLYING THIS DEFINITION REGARD SHALL BE HAD TO THE FOLLOWING FACTORS, TO SOCIAL PROGRESS, WHICH RECOGNISES THE NEEDS OF EVERYONE; EFFECTIVE PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT; PRUDENT USE OF NATURAL RESOURCES AND MAINTENANCE OF HIGH AND STABLE LEVELS OF ECONOMIC GROWTH AND EMPLOYMENT. IN PURSUIT OF ITS OBJECTS THE CHARITY SHALL ENDEAVOUR TO ENGAGE THE PARTICIPATION OF ALL SECTORS OF THE COMMUNITY IN ITS ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
LONDON AND ESSEX AND THAMES GATEWAY AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
THAMES CHASE
THE FOREST CENTRE
BROADFIELDS FARM
PIKE LANE
UPMINSTER
RM14 3NS
- Phone:
- 01708642970
- Email:
- enquiries@thameschase.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window