THE FRIENDS OF THE CHURCH OF SAINT MARY AND ALL SAINTS, CHECKLEY

Charity number: 1115219
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £2.37k £1.49k £1.51k £1.88k £3.30k
Total expenditure £5.78k £1.97k £1.32k £2.65k £3.85k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A