Financial history THE CARL CHAPMAN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 1115409
Charity reporting is overdue by 144 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £3.57k £3.15k £2.13k £240 £100
Total expenditure £310 £3.26k £2.06k £419 £1.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A