Accounts and annual returns WEALD OF KENT DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1116331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 21 September 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 July 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 08 July 2019 158 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 08 July 2019 158 days late Download Open in new window