Financial history WEALD OF KENT DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1116331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £27.24k £20.76k £19.94k £14.59k £15.15k
Total expenditure £40.10k £138 £53 £169.63k £45
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A