THE SOMALI INTEGRATION & ADVOCACY CENTRE

Charity number: 1115720
Charity reporting is overdue by 1688 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 10 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Accounts and TAR 10 April 2020 Overdue Overdue by 227 days
Annual return 10 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 593 days
Accounts and TAR 10 April 2019 Overdue Overdue by 593 days
Annual return 10 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 958 days
Accounts and TAR 10 April 2018 Overdue Overdue by 958 days
Annual return 10 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1323 days
Accounts and TAR 10 April 2017 Overdue Overdue by 1323 days
Annual return 10 April 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1688 days
Accounts and TAR 10 April 2016 Overdue Overdue by 1688 days