FRIENDS OF STEYNING GRAMMAR SCHOOL

Charity number: 1115430
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £11.90k £10.74k £21.77k £7.70k £9.61k
Total expenditure £10.54k £10.79k £17.69k £8.68k £4.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A