ST JOSEPH'S PTA

Charity number: 1115464
Charity reporting is overdue by 872 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Overdue Overdue by 141 days
Annual return 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 506 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Overdue Overdue by 506 days
Annual return 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 872 days
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 Overdue Overdue by 872 days
Annual return 31 July 2017 31 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2016 24 September 2017 116 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 Not Required