ST JOSEPH'S PTA

Charity number: 1115464
Charity reporting is overdue by 841 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2013 31/07/2014 31/07/2015 31/07/2016 31/07/2017
Total gross income £9.21k £9.16k £8.08k £6.03k £8.50k
Total expenditure £8.96k £2.15k £435 £1.68k £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A