BEDFORDSHIRE AND LUTON LEARNING ENRICHMENT TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of education for the benefit of communities in England, in particular by enabling and promoting learning opportunities, information, advice and guidance and social inclusion.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
- Hertfordshire
- Luton
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 August 2006: Standard registration
- 29 July 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 29 July 2015: Funds transferred to 1056876 FIRST PLACE (BEDFORDSHIRE)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24 | £24 | £8.03k | £6.79k | £47.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.48k | £5.38k | £46.46k | £9.88k | £45.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 19 December 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2014
(These accounts |
19 December 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 05 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 14 November 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 27/06/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 11/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF COMMUNITIES IN ENGLAND, IN PARTICULAR BY ENABLING AND PROMOTING LEARNING OPPORTUNITIES, INFORMATION, ADVICE AND GUIDANCE AND SOCIAL INCLUSION.
Area of benefit
ENGLAND
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window