CATALYST TAVISTOCK

Charity number: 1118950
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Trevor David Atkinson Trustee 01 November 2017 None on record
DUNCAN JOHN BIRD Trustee 01 May 2016
NICHOLAS WATTS' GIFT Received: On time
Katherine Maria Palmer Trustee 29 November 2017 None on record
CATHERINE STOATE Trustee 01 January 2015
WHITCHURCH HALL Received: On time
HOME-START SOUTH AND WEST DEVON LTD Received: On time
Rev Robert Weston Trustee 24 June 2020 None on record
TIM SHOBROOK Trustee
PEARN ALMSHOUSES Received: On time
Ross Iain Hilton Mitchell Trustee 18 September 2019
MILTON COMBE VILLAGE HALL Received: On time
MR GEOFF ORTON Trustee None on record
Susan Mary Savage Trustee 01 June 2018 None on record