Accounts and annual returns APEX TRUST

Charity number: 1116216
Charity reporting is overdue by 328 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 328 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 November 2020 142 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 19 November 2020 142 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 11 January 2020 195 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 11 January 2020 195 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2017 08 November 2018 131 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 08 November 2018 131 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2016 08 November 2018 496 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 21 May 2018 325 days late Download Open in new window