Financial history APEX TRUST

Charity number: 1116216
Charity reporting is overdue by 329 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £346.14k £382.63k £389.42k £344.28k £364.97k
Total expenditure £288.06k £320.97k £285.18k £349.60k £393.31k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £57.48k £58.51k £82.00k £63.33k £82.79k