BORLASE SMART JOHN WELLS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1118840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 20 November 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 27 November 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 13 November 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2018 07 November 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 01 November 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2017 14 November 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 14 November 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 March 2016 13 December 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 26 October 2016 On time Download