BORLASE SMART JOHN WELLS TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1118840
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £162.62k £115.27k £233.63k £171.76k £204.21k
Total expenditure £111.07k £122.15k £142.77k £154.89k £154.35k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £42.50k N/A £20.00k