Linked charities BORLASE SMART JOHN WELLS TRUST LIMITED
Charity number: 1118840

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE AND TRUST DEED DATED 7 MARCH 1949 AS VARIED BY SCHEMES OF THE 9 FEBRUARY 1972, 29 DECEMBER 1995, 7 DECEMBER 2002, 15 DECEMBER 2005 AND 4 JANUARY 2008
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE HIGHEST STANDARD OF PAINTING SCULPTURE ETCHING WOODCUTTING AND OTHER GRAPHIC ARTS IN ST IVES AND THE DISTRICT OF PENWITH IN THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL FOR THE PURPOSE OF INCREASING PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF THE SAID ARTS
Area of benefit
ST IVES AND THE DISTRICT OF PENWITH CORNWALL
Registration history
- 18 January 2008 : Standard registration
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.