NORTH EAST SUFFOLK CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1115522
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ALASTAIR JEREMY DENZIL CABORN Trustee 23 November 2020
BRADWELL POORS ALLOTMENT Received: On time
Leanne Kay Munro Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Steven Alderson Chair 15 February 2021
BECCLES AND DISTRICT REGENERATION LIMITED Received: On time
JAN WICKHAM Trustee 28 November 2011 None on record
Peggy Ann McGregor Trustee 11 December 2017 None on record
Vaughan Rhys Jarvis Trustee 15 February 2021
SOUTHWOLD MUSEUM & HISTORICAL SOCIETY Received: On time
COUNCILLOR MALCOLM PITCHERS Trustee
KIRKLEY POOR'S LANDS Received: On time
Stephen Curtis Trustee 21 September 2020 None on record
PETER JOHN STEVENSON STOTT Trustee
LOWESTOFT LIONS CLUB (CIO) Recently registered