LOWE HOUSE ST HELENS BOXING CLUB

Charity number: 1116349
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £7.72k £9.16k £9.86k £9.62k £3.68k
Total expenditure £9.56k £7.48k £8.41k £10.15k £4.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A