ST SWITHUNS C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL FUND

Charity number: 1117697
Charity reporting is overdue by 851 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Overdue Overdue by 120 days
Annual return 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 485 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Overdue Overdue by 485 days
Annual return 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 851 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Overdue Overdue by 851 days
Annual return 31 August 2017 23 October 2018 115 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2016 28 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 Not Required