Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF MEADOWSIDE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1118105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2021 21 December 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 December 2021 174 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 07 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2018 07 January 2020 191 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2017 30 May 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 Not Required