Financial history FRIENDS OF MEADOWSIDE ACADEMY

Charity number: 1118105
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £9.60k £5.95k £6.11k £6.35k £1.91k
Total expenditure £7.04k £11.65k £3.92k £8.42k £2.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A