I-CHURCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
i-church is a web based Christian community of the Church of England rooted in the Diocese of Oxford under the pastoral care of the Bishop of Oxford, and led by the Web Pastor. It provides both for people exploring Christian discipleship and not belonging to a local congregation, and additional support beyond local worshipping communities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 31 August 2006: Standard registration
- 29 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.22k | £1.17k | £1.98k | £566 | £460 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.23k | £1.10k | £885 | £1.10k | £780 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 JUNE 2005.
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED TO USE THE INTERNET AS A MEANS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION IN AND FROM THE ANGLICAN DIOCESE OF OXFORD.
Area of benefit
NOT STRICTLY DEFINED. IN PRACTICE OXFORD AND WORLDWIDE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window