MOUNT ST MARY'S

Charity number: 1117998
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 COVID filing extension granted
Annual return 31 August 2019 01 September 2020 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 01 September 2020 63 days late Download
Annual return 31 August 2018 10 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 10 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2017 06 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2016 29 June 2017 On time Download