MOUNT ST MARY'S

Charity number: 1117998

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Trevor Wragg Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record
Ian Murphy Trustee 01 September 2016
CHILDREN FOR CHILDREN Received: On time
Professor Martial Jean-Marie Staub Trustee 10 September 2015 None on record
Rev Simon David Ellis Trustee 27 June 2018 None on record
Sara Clarkson Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record
Michael Burrowes Trustee 20 June 2018 None on record
William George Shaw Trustee 01 February 2018 None on record
Hardip Nijjar Trustee 30 September 2019 None on record
James Phinn Trustee 01 September 2016
THE MOUNT ST MARY'S CHARITABLE FUND Overdue by 88 days
FATHER MICHAEL BEATTIE SJ Trustee
THE MOUNT ST MARY'S CHARITABLE FUND Overdue by 88 days
Fr Adrian Porter Chair 08 December 2014
THE CHRISTIAN HERITAGE CENTRE AT STONYHURST
FORMATIO Received: On time