FREE THE CHILD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
FREE THE CHILD RUNS A CHARITY SHOP IN COLINDALE, NORTH WEST LONDON TO SUPPORT DEPRIVED ADULT AND YOUNG PEOPLE
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 24 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
7 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Barnet
- Haringey
- Nigeria
Governance
- 24 July 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Care Quality Commission
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GLADYS WILLIAMS | Trustee | 01 January 2009 |
|
|
||||
ELIZABETH SADE WILLIAMS | Trustee | 20 February 2007 |
|
|||||
CAROLINE OLAOYE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 24/12/2019 | 24/12/2020 | 24/12/2021 | 24/12/2022 | 24/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.32k | £34.20k | £74.66k | £60.10k | £69.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.85k | £19.09k | £59.41k | £46.63k | £51.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.44k | £15.75k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 24 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 December 2022 | 22 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 December 2021 | 24 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 December 2020 | 12 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 24 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 24 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 1 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED 21 DECEMBER 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN HARINGEY (THEREINAFTER CALLED THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') AND, IN PARTICULAR, DEVELOPMENT OF INFORMATION SYSTEMS FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO INCREASE INDIVIDUAL CHILDREN'S CAPACITY.
Area of benefit
HARINGEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Colin Parade
Colindale
LONDON
NW9 6SG
- Phone:
- 07722878315
- Email:
- freethechild@hotmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window