FASHION RETAIL ACADEMY

Charity number: 1119540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £7.32m £7.20m £8.69m £10.13m £11.09m
Total expenditure £6.71m £7.31m £8.17m £9.46m £10.80m
Income from government contracts £3.31m £3.76m N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £4.72m £4.84m £5.82m
Income - Donations and legacies £2.77m £2.02m £2.00m £1.95m £1.95m
Income - Other trading activities £349.00k £385.00k £0 £0 £108.00k
Income - Charitable activities £4.20m £4.79m £6.48m £8.18m £3.13m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £1.00k £3.00k £4.00k £3.00k £11.00k
Income - Other £0 £0 £207.00k £0 £73.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.71m £7.31m £8.17m £9.46m £10.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £46.00k £45.00k £51.00k £59.00k £54.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £771.00k