FASHION RETAIL ACADEMY

Charity number: 1119540
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Laura Michelle Charles Trustee 27 June 2017 None on record
Sally Claire Louise Harris Trustee 11 January 2021
THE ROYAL NATIONAL INSTITUTE FOR DEAF PEOPLE Received: On time
James Michael Barron Trustee 20 December 2018 None on record
Elaine Susan Smith Trustee 11 June 2014 None on record
Pauline Ann Tambling CBE Trustee 18 May 2021
THEATRE ROYAL HAYMARKET MASTERCLASS TRUST Received: On time
THE ROUNDHOUSE TRUST Received: 33 days late
Fiona Marie Gaughan Trustee 20 December 2018 None on record
LEE LUCAS Trustee 06 October 2014 None on record
Susanna Victoria Kempe Trustee 03 March 2021 None on record
ELIZABETH ROUSE Trustee 11 July 2011 None on record
KIM LONGMAN Trustee None on record
Vanessa Spence Trustee 20 December 2018 None on record