Financial history THE NORTH LONDON COLLEGIATE SCHOOL

Charity number: 1115843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022
Total gross income £24.72m £25.85m £25.41m £25.17m £27.78m
Total expenditure £22.33m £23.34m £23.21m £23.25m £25.09m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £695.40k £633.99k £614.10k £544.58k £677.13k
Income - Other trading activities £2.14m £2.46m £2.91m £2.56m £3.36m
Income - Charitable activities £21.49m £22.12m £21.32m £21.52m £23.12m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £393.72k £627.71k £574.59k £541.30k £625.40k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £100.00k £0 £0 £2.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £20.62m £21.22m £21.33m £21.58m £22.99m
Expenditure - Raising funds £422.56k £276.20k £234.89k £261.09k £262.60k
Expenditure - Governance £180.57k £158.94k £181.15k £199.36k £254.70k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £143.49k £25.98k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.29m £1.84m £1.65m £1.41m £1.84m