Arts University Plymouth Charitable Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing support for current and ex students of Plymouth College of Art. Supporting Plymouth College of Art to achieve its objectives
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 19 April 2007: Standard registration
- JENEFER PETER AND MARY PETER BURSARY FUND (Working name)
- PCA CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- PCAD CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Louise Fysh | Chair | 05 July 2018 |
|
|||||
Anna Dermitzaki | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Louise Walsh | Trustee | 16 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ross James Middleham | Trustee | 26 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sally Geraghty | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Patricia Bleazard | Trustee | 05 July 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.82k | £2.43k | £2.28k | £2.60k | £2.33k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.51k | £5.87k | £2.27k | £4.02k | £4.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 15 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 12 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23 MAY 2006. CHANGE OF NAME 20 OCTOBER 2009 as amended on 29 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE BENEFITS TO CURRENT AND EX-STUDENTS TO SUPPORT THEIR CONTINUING EDUCATION; AND 2. TO SUPPORT THE COLLEGE IN ITS EDUCATIONAL MISSION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE PLYMOUTH, DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Plymouth College of Art
Tavistock Place
Plymouth
PL4 8AT
- Phone:
- 01752203434
- Email:
- finance@pca.ac.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window