BANGLADESH WELFARE CENTRE NEWBURY

Charity number: 1115793
Charity reporting is up to date (25 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 25 May 2021 25 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 25 May 2021 25 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 21 August 2020 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 21 August 2020 113 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 31 December 2019 245 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 06 January 2020 251 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 28 April 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 28 April 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 19 June 2017 50 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016 31 August 2017 123 days late Download