KELLY TRUST (CREDITON)

Charity number: 1116644
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
WILLIAM JOHN CROOKE Trustee 10 April 2018
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
SANDFORD RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
James King Trustee 11 October 2016
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
MR JO WARD Trustee
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
CREDITON PARISH CHURCH MUSIC ENDOWMENT FUND Received: On time
Rosemary Cheriton Trustee 11 October 2016
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
CHRIS NICHOLL Trustee
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
HAYWARDS EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
DAVID BRASSINGTON Trustee 10 October 2017
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
ANDREW ALBERT WHITE Chair
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
CREDITON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY Received: On time
ERNEST JOHN HEARD Trustee 08 April 2014
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
MR MICHAEL BESKEEN Trustee
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF CREDITON CHURCH Received: On time
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
COLIN MICHAEL CLARK Trustee
QE ACADEMY TRUST EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
GEORGE JOHN MORTIMER Trustee 16 August 2011
CHURCH CORPORATION TRUST Received: On time
QE ACADEMY TRUST EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION Received: On time
BENJAMIN CLEAVE'S CHARITY Received: On time
THE DUNN AND THOMAS FOUNDATION Received: On time
CHARITY OF BENJAMIN WOOD CLEAVE Received: On time