Accounts and annual returns DR ANDERSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1116443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 08 November 2020 19 October 2021 41 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 November 2020 Not Required
Annual return 08 November 2019 11 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 November 2019 Not Required
Annual return 08 November 2018 27 January 2020 141 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 November 2018 Not Required
Annual return 08 November 2017 31 August 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 08 November 2017 Not Required
Annual return 08 November 2016 31 October 2017 53 days late
Accounts and TAR 08 November 2016 Not Required