Financial history DR ANDERSON CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1116443
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/11/2016 08/11/2017 08/11/2018 08/11/2019 08/11/2020
Total gross income £181 £130 £147 £194 £0
Total expenditure £1.56k £1.55k £457 £0 £1.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A