THE BEN WILLIAMS TRUST

Charity number: 1116627
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £13.82k £19.52k £14.44k £56.54k £13.37k
Total expenditure £39.98k £399 £383 £383 £37.88k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A