AL-IMAN SOCIETY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity number: 1117020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 29 December 2020 19 August 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2020 19 August 2021 On time Download
Annual return 29 December 2019 30 August 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2019 30 August 2020 On time Download
Annual return 29 December 2018 06 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2018

(These accounts
have been qualified)

06 October 2019 On time Download
Annual return 29 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time Download
Annual return 29 December 2016 17 October 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 29 December 2016 17 October 2017 On time Download