AL-IMAN SOCIETY OF NORTHAMPTONSHIRE

Charity number: 1117020
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/12/2016 29/12/2017 29/12/2018 29/12/2019 29/12/2020
Total gross income £78.56k £64.08k £44.05k £68.58k £58.54k
Total expenditure £61.26k £60.67k £46.62k £50.08k £46.83k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A