ADAM OUTREACH PROJECT

Charity number: 1117871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2020 08 March 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 08 March 2021 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2019 16 September 2020 139 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2019 16 September 2020 139 days late Download
Annual return 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2018 29 April 2019 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2017 08 March 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2017 08 March 2018 On time Download
Annual return 30 June 2016 22 March 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2016

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 March 2017 On time Download