Financial history SOLAR AID

Charity number: 1115960
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022
Total gross income £1.42m £2.26m £2.55m £1.73m £2.80m
Total expenditure £1.35m £1.49m £1.93m £1.74m £2.44m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £166.26k £232.47k N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £856.41k £1.64m £1.82m £1.32m £769.98k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £561.50k £606.27k £706.33k £408.71k £1.88m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £29 £42 £281 £103 £37
Income - Other £6.36k £14.05k £21.01k £426 £150.31k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £1.32m £1.69m £1.44m £1.96m
Expenditure - Raising funds £137.80k £174.05k £237.21k £300.71k £477.78k
Expenditure - Governance £34.43k £0 £45.31k £33.50k £39.56k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0