Financial history FRIENDS OF ST ANNES CHURCH CATTERICK VILLAGE

Charity number: 1115962
Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021
Total gross income £1.12k £4.31k £4.06k £1.43k £37
Total expenditure £2.12k £205 £5.33k £245 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A