THE GALVANI CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1116060
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2020 04 September 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2019 03 February 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2018 23 May 2019 107 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2018 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2017 16 February 2018 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2016 27 February 2017 22 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2016 Not Required