GARDEN ROUTE CHILDREN'S TRUST

Charity number: 1116278
Charity reporting is up to date
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 02 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 02 June 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 15 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 15 June 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2017 13 June 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 13 June 2018 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2016 23 June 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 23 June 2017 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2015 20 September 2016 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2015 14 June 2016 On time
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)