LINCOLN INTERNATIONAL CHAMBER MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1116781
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 29/02/2016 28/02/2017 28/02/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £46.76k £53.13k £57.61k £42.43k £9.25k
Total expenditure £43.38k £56.90k £51.71k £40.73k £11.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £2.00k N/A £2.20k N/A